F.P. Development, LLC v. Canton Township of Canton Michigan

Plaintiff: F.P. Development, LLC
Defendant: Canton Township of Canton Michigan
Case Number: 2:2018cv13690
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich appearing on behalf of F.P. Development, LLC (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED #13 Counterclaim, by Canton Township of Canton Michigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (McLaughlin, Anne)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting leave to amend Counter-Complaint. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephon B. Bagne on behalf of F.P. Development, LLC. (Bagne, Stephon)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 COUNTERCLAIM VERIFIED filed by Canton Township of Canton Michigan against F.P. Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (McLaughlin, Anne)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Canton Township of Canton Michigan. (McLaughlin, Anne)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Earl Henneke appearing on behalf of F.P. Development, LLC (Henneke, Robert)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Chance Dean Weldon appearing on behalf of F.P. Development, LLC (Weldon, Chance)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Morita on behalf of Canton Township of Canton Michigan. (Morita, Stephanie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kristin B. Kolb appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Kolb, Kristin)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Canton Township of Canton Michigan re #6 Notice of Appearance AMENDED (McLaughlin, Anne)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne McClorey McLaughlin on behalf of Canton Township of Canton Michigan. (McLaughlin, Anne)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ronald A. King appearing on behalf of F.P. Development, LLC (King, Ronald)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Pattwell, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia M. Filipovich on behalf of F.P. Development, LLC. (Filipovich, Cynthia)
November 27, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Canton Township of Canton Michigan* (DWor)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by F.P. Development, LLC against Canton Township of Canton Michigan. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7002976 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pattwell, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F.P. Development, LLC v. Canton Township of Canton Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.P. Development, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Pattwell
Represented By: Robert Earl Henneke
Represented By: Chance Dean Weldon
Represented By: Theodore Cirilo Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: Cynthia M. Filipovich
Represented By: Stephon B. Bagne
Represented By: Ronald A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canton Township of Canton Michigan
Represented By: Kristin B. Kolb
Represented By: Anne McClorey McLaughlin
Represented By: Stephanie S. Morita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?