Terrell v. Roseville, City of et al

Plaintiff: Tyrone Terrell
Defendant: Roseville, City of and Frank Dotsie
Case Number: 2:2018cv13724
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Anthony P Patti
1 Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 16 MOTION for discovery pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure No. 26 duty to disclose and request for admissions by Tyrone Terrell. (DPer)
January 16, 2019 15 RESPONSE to defendants' motion for dismissal or alternatively, for summary judgment (not on docket) by Tyrone Terrell. (DPer)
January 9, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #14 Order to Show Cause on Tyrone Terrell at 12268 Kilbourtne, Detroit, MI 48214. (MLan)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER for Tyrone Terrell to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
December 26, 2018 13 COPY of #4 Notice mailed to Tyrone Terrell and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
December 21, 2018 12 CLAIM for Damages by Frank Dotsie, Roseville, City of. (Young, Carlito)[DOCUMENT IS AN ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES] Modified on 12/26/2018 (DPer).
December 21, 2018 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Frank Dotsie, Roseville, City of. (Young, Carlito)[COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RECEIVED BY ROSEVILLE, CITY OF] Modified on 12/26/2018 (DPer).
December 21, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Dean Hanchett on behalf of Frank Dotsie, Roseville, City of. (Hanchett, Michael)
December 21, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlito H. Young on behalf of Frank Dotsie, Roseville, City of. (Young, Carlito)
December 18, 2018 8 COPIES of pro-se documentation mailed to Tyrone Terrell and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
December 6, 2018 7 EXHIBIT A re #1 Complaint by Tyrone Terrell (ATee)
December 6, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Roseville, City of served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (ATee)
December 6, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Frank Dotsie served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (ATee)
December 4, 2018 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 30, 2018 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)
November 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tyrone Terrell against defendants; Receipt No: 118553 - Fee: $ 400. (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrell v. Roseville, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseville, City of
Represented By: Carlito H. Young
Represented By: Michael Dean Hanchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dotsie
Represented By: Carlito H. Young
Represented By: Michael Dean Hanchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?