Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al v. Orthopedic, P.C.
Plaintiff: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Trumbull Insurance Company, Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Orthopedic, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13744
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference re-set for 2/7/2019 @ 10:30 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (LBar)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Twin City Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc for Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Murray, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trumbull Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc for Trumbull Insurance Company. (Murray, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc for Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. (Murray, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. (Murray, Thomas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2019 @ 10:45 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (LBar)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Rosenberg, Eric)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance on Plaintiff's Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Affirmative Defenses) (Rosenberg, Eric)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph L. Falzon appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Falzon, Joseph)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #1 Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 1/11/2019) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric J. Rosenberg appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Rosenberg, Eric)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Orthopedic, P.C. (Murray, Thomas)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Orthopedic, P.C.* (SKra)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7012390 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Hartford - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - HCPCS Public Meeting Agenda 5/28/14, #2 Exhibit 2 - P-STIM not covered by Medicare, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amounts improperly billed by Defendant) (Murray, Thomas)
December 3, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al v. Orthopedic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthopedic, P.C.
Represented By: Joseph L. Falzon
Represented By: Eric J. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trumbull Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?