Higbee v. Eastern Michigan University

Plaintiff: Mark Higbee
Defendant: Eastern Michigan University, James Webb, Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, Eunice Jeffries, Michael Morris, Joline Davis, Michelle Crumm, Dennis Beagan, David Woike, Wade Tornquist, David Turner, James Smith, Rhonda Longworth, Mary Treder Lang, James Carroll, Alexander Simpson and Michael Hawks
Case Number: 2:2018cv13761
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Sean F Cox
1 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order 26 Order Vacating #21 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. (Answers due by 2/15/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar)
January 29, 2019 25 PETITION SHOWING CAUSE WHY ABOVE-ENTITLED CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE PURSUANT TO E.D. MICH. LR 41.2 by Mark Higbee. (Lenhoff, Glen)
January 29, 2019 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. VanOver on behalf of All Defendants. (VanOver, Ryan)
January 29, 2019 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Hermon on behalf of All Defendants. (Hermon, James)
January 29, 2019 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. Wheaton on behalf of All Defendants. (Wheaton, Jill)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 2/8/2019 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar)
December 21, 2018 20 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Alexander Simpson served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 19 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Webb served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Morris served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 17 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Eunice Jeffries served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michael Hawks served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dennis Beagan served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 14 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mary Treder Lang served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michelle Crumm served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rhonda Longworth served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. David Woike served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. David Turner served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joline Davis served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wade Tornquist served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Carroll served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. James Smith served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 21, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Eastern Michigan University served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 7, 2018 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Dennis Beagan, James Carroll, Michelle Crumm, Joline Davis, Eastern Michigan University, Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, Michael Hawks, Eunice Jeffries, Rhonda Longworth, Michael Morris, Alexander Simpson, James Smith, Wade Tornquist, Mary Treder Lang, David Turner, James Webb, David Woike* (SKra)
December 5, 2018 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents, James Smith, James Carroll, Wade Tornquist, Joline Davis, David Turner, David Woike, Rhonda Longworth, Michelle Crumm, Mary Treder Lang, Dennis Beagan, Michael Hawks, Eunice Jeffries, Michael Morris, James Webb, Alexander Simpson. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #2 Summons Issued, Notice of Error, #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Lenhoff, Glen)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE of Error directed to: Glen N. Lenhoff re #1 Complaint. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DWor)
December 4, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Eastern Michigan University* (DWor)
December 4, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark Higbee against Eastern Michigan University with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7015115 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Lenhoff, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higbee v. Eastern Michigan University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Michigan University
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Webb
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Michigan University Board of Regents
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eunice Jeffries
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Morris
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joline Davis
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Crumm
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Beagan
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Woike
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Tornquist
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Turner
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Smith
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Longworth
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Treder Lang
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Carroll
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Simpson
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hawks
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Represented By: Ryan J. VanOver
Represented By: James F. Hermon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Higbee
Represented By: Glen N. Lenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?