I Pee Holding LLC v. Gloworks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: I Pee Holding LLC
Defendant: Gloworks, Inc. and Joseph Iacona
Case Number: 2:2018cv13848
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING on #13 MOTION Leave to Take Discovery In Aid of Default Judgment ,and #12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (EKar)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Leave to Take Discovery In Aid of Default Judgment by I Pee Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Discovery, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claim chart, #3 Exhibit 3 - ROS, #4 Exhibit 4 - Default, #5 Exhibit 5 - Obedilah case, #6 Exhibit 6 - GP case, #7 Brief, #8 Certificate of service) (Reed, Eric)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by I Pee Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claim chart, #3 Exhibit 3 - ROS, #4 Exhibit 4 - Default entry, #5 Exhibit 5 - Military affidavit, #6 Brief, #7 Certificate of Service) (Reed, Eric)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Joseph Iacona* (SOso)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Gloworks, Inc.* (SOso)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All Defendants by I Pee Holding LLC. (Reed, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joseph Iacona served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Reed, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gloworks, Inc. served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Reed, Eric)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Patent Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Joseph Iacona* (SKra)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent by I Pee Holding LLC (Reed, Eric)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Gloworks, Inc.* (SKra)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by I Pee Holding LLC (Reed, Eric)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by I Pee Holding LLC against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of state - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 461 patent, #2 Exhibit B - Gloworks data, #3 Exhibit C - 10 30 18 letter, #4 Exhibit D - 11 26 18 letter) (Reed, Eric)
December 11, 2018 FILING FEE Received in the amount of $400 - Receipt No. 0645-7025835 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I Pee Holding LLC v. Gloworks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Iacona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I Pee Holding LLC
Represented By: Eric E. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?