Gray v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Billie Gray
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv13888
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference (TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2019 11:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith.) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BGar)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Cramer, Kaitlyn)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Removal #1 . Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 19, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn A. Cramer on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Cramer, Kaitlyn)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 18-014701-NF. Receipt No: 0645-7029937 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Baas, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Gray
Represented By: Brent F. Sitto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlyn A. Cramer
Represented By: Jason W. Baas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?