Rhodes-Colts v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: April Rhodes-Colts
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13934
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Marianne O Battani
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT FEDERAL LAW GOVERNS THE STANDARD OF CARE FOR PLAINTIFFS STATE-LAW NEGLIGENCE CLAIMS, BUT MICHIGAN LAW SOLELY GOVERNS PLAINTIFFS ALLEGED DAMAGES Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (KDoa)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/30/2019 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 10/31/2019 Signed by District Judge Marianne O. Battani. (Refer to image for additional dates) (CMot)
January 16, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/22/19 is CANCELLED re #4 Notice to Appear. Court will review Discovery Plan submitted by parties. (KDoa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Torpey, Scott)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFENDANT by April Rhodes-Colts. (Dovitz, Douglas)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy James O'Connell appearing on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (O'Connell, Timothy)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justin M. Schmidt appearing on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Schmidt, Justin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 03:00 PM before District Judge Marianne O. Battani (REFER TO IMAGE FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION REGARDING DISCOVERY PLAN) (KDoa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by American Airlines, Inc.. (Torpey, Scott)
December 19, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Airlines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants American Airlines, Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 18-015174-NO. Receipt No: 0645-7034261 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Torpey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes-Colts v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Torpey
Represented By: Justin M. Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy James O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Rhodes-Colts
Represented By: Douglas S. Dovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?