Jones v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joy Jones
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A., Webbank and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv13945
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Scheduling Conference held on 2/13/2019. (MLan)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Witnesses to be exchanged by 3/11/2019, Discovery Motions to be filed by 7/12/2019, Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/12/2019, Joint Final Pretrial Order due 12/12/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MLan)
February 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Scheduling Conference held on 2/11/2019. (MLan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stuart M. Schwartz appearing on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC and Certificate of Service (Schwartz, Stuart)
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Nitzkin, Gary)
February 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B. Green on behalf of Webbank. (Green, Patrick)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Webbank identifying Corporate Parent Steel Partners Holdings, L.P., Corporate Parent WebFinancial Holding Corporation for Webbank. (Savran, Jessica)
February 1, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Webbank. (Savran, Jessica)
January 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tameika Lavenia Montgomery on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, Tameika)
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Misty L. Peterson on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Peterson, Misty)
January 29, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 2/11/2019 03:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bank of America, N.A. served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Webbank served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Kolkmeyer on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Bank of America, N.A. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Response by Defendant Webbank to #1 Complaint: Response due by 2/1/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)[DOCUMENT IS ONLY A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; APPEARANCE TO BE E-FILED] Modified on 1/3/2019 (DPer).
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Poling, Colin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Response by Bank of America to #1 Complaint: Response due by 2/2/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Zoe Savran on behalf of Webbank. (Savran, Jessica)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Zora on behalf of Webbank. (Zora, Robert)
December 19, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Rang on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Rang, Laura)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transunion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Poling, Colin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin C. Poling on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Poling, Colin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from 46th District Court, Oakland County, Michigan, case number GC184568. Receipt No: 0645-7035478 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint To Trans Union, LLC, #4 Exhibit C - Webbank's Consent To Removal) (Poling, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. Bolton
Represented By: Stuart M. Schwartz
Represented By: Misty L. Peterson
Represented By: Tameika Lavenia Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle L. Kolkmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webbank
Represented By: Robert P. Zora
Represented By: Jessica Zoe Savran
Represented By: Patrick B. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Colin C. Poling
Represented By: Laura K. Rang
Represented By: Brian A. Nettleingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Jones
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?