Shahid et al v. American Airlines

Plaintiff: Nada Mashgari and Salman Shahid
Defendant: American Airlines
Case Number: 2:2018cv13966
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Anthony P Patti
Referring Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Torpey, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh 26(f) Discovery Plan due 2/13/19 (MBea)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Timothy James O'Connell appearing on behalf of American Airlines (O'Connell, Timothy)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justin M. Schmidt appearing on behalf of American Airlines (Schmidt, Justin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justin M. Schmidt appearing on behalf of American Airlines (Schmidt, Justin)[FILING ERROR: DOCUMENT FILED ON INCORRECT CASE; CLERK'S OFFICE CONTACTED BY E-FILING ATTORNEY] Modified on 12/26/2018 (DPer).
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by American Airlines. (Torpey, Scott)
December 20, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American Airlines (Torpey, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Airlines from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2018-4563-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7037853 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Torpey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shahid et al v. American Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nada Mashgari
Represented By: Muneeb Mirza Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salman Shahid
Represented By: Muneeb Mirza Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines
Represented By: Scott R. Torpey
Represented By: Justin M. Schmidt
Represented By: Timothy James O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?