Altair ProductDesign, Inc. et al v. Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of et al
Plaintiff: Kiran Ambekar, Shyam Prasad Pittala, Aditya Reddy Maram Reddy, Govil Mandhyani, Yeuheng Huang, Altair ProductDesign, Inc., Chandrasekar Ramasubramanian, Karan Nitin Mangaonkar, Raghav Rajan Ravi, Hongtao Gu, Ghouse Mohiuddin Mohammad, Vijay Kumar Chenegarapu, Tithal Bhandari and Abhishek Vasant Kad
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of, California Service Center, Director of and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of
Case Number: 2:2018cv13967
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
3 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 4/12/2019, Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Goulding on behalf of All Defendants. (Goulding, Jonathan)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge David M. Lawson and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (NAhm)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. DHS served on 12/27/2018. (Abrutyn, Russell)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. USCIS served on 12/27/2018. (Abrutyn, Russell)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Defendants. (Abrutyn, Russell)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 12/27/2018. (Abrutyn, Russell)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (LGra)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
December 21, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7038581 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:18-cv-13493, Judge Laurie J. Michelson] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Ambekar denial, #3 Exhibit B - Bhandari denial, #4 Exhibit C - Chenegarapu denial, #5 Exhibit D - Gu denial, #6 Exhibit E - Huang denial, #7 Exhibit F - Kad denial, #8 Exhibit G - Mandhyani denial, #9 Exhibit H - Mangaonkar denial, #10 Exhibit I - Maram Reddy denial, #11 Exhibit J - Mohammad denial, #12 Exhibit K - Pittala denial, #13 Exhibit L - Ramasubramanian denial, #14 Exhibit M - Ravi denial) (Abrutyn, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altair ProductDesign, Inc. et al v. Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiran Ambekar
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shyam Prasad Pittala
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aditya Reddy Maram Reddy
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Govil Mandhyani
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yeuheng Huang
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altair ProductDesign, Inc.
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandrasekar Ramasubramanian
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karan Nitin Mangaonkar
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raghav Rajan Ravi
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hongtao Gu
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ghouse Mohiuddin Mohammad
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vijay Kumar Chenegarapu
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tithal Bhandari
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abhishek Vasant Kad
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Service Center, Director of
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?