BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company v. Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation

Plaintiff: BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company
Defendant: Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv13970
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
1 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation. (Killips, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Filing 22 APPENDIX by Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation to Motion to Dismiss (Killips, Jason)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED ORDER Resolving (Dkt. #2 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BGar)
January 30, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on January 31, 2019 is Cancelled. (Sandusky, K)
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company of withdrawal of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . (Wassom, Brian)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BGar)
January 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing RESET for 1/31/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (BGar)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company. (Wassom, Brian)
January 15, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) filed by BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company against Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 10-17) (Wassom, Brian)
January 9, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation. (Killips, Jason)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company against Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-8) (Wassom, Brian)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding December 21, 2018 Status Conference ( Response due by 1/9/2019, Reply due by 1/15/2019, Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 21, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/21/2018. (Sandusky, K)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation (Killips, Jason)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 01:45 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call, and then include the Court by calling (313) 234-5240 when all parties are on the line. (Sandusky, K)
December 21, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/21/2018. (Court Reporter: David Yarbrough) (Sandusky, K)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued for *Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation* (LGra)
December 21, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation. (Killips, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Notice of Telephonic Motion Hearing (Dkt. 8) is STRICKEN, entry was made in error. The Court sets a TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 12/21/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call, and then include the Court by calling (313) 234-5240 when all parties are on the line. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 [STRICKEN] NOTICE OF HEARING BY TELEPHONE on #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call, and then include the Court by calling (313) 234-5240 when all parties are on the line. (Sandusky, K) Modified on 12/20/2018 (Sandusky, K).
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company identifying Corporate Parent BorgWarner Inc. for BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company. (Wassom, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lynn Pullen on behalf of BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company. (Pullen, Katherine)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin W. Bone on behalf of BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company. (Bone, Devin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason D. Killips on behalf of Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation. (Killips, Jason)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel N. Sharkey on behalf of Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation. (Sharkey, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - TRW Inc v Industrial Systems Associates Inc., #3 Exhibit B - Daniels v State Farm Mut Auto Ins Co, #4 Exhibit C - Almetals Inc v Wickeder Westfalenstah L, GmbH, #5 Exhibit D - Key Safety Systems, Inc. v Invista S.A.R.L., L.L.C., #6 Exhibit E - Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer Spine, Inc. v Pamela Albring, #7 Exhibit F - Superior Consulting Company, Inc. v Michael F. Walling, #8 Exhibit G - Proposed Order) (Wassom, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) filed by BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company against Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7038843 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declarations, #3 Exhibit 2 - BorgWarner Terms and Conditions, #4 Exhibit 3 - Purchase Order 902660, #5 Exhibit 4 - Purchase Order 902661, #6 Exhibit 5 - Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit 6 - BorgWarners October 29, 2018 letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - Principals October 21, 2018 letter, #9 Exhibit 8 - Capacity Analysis Report Form) (Wassom, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company v. Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Manufacturing Corp., an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Daniel N. Sharkey
Represented By: Jason D. Killips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BorgWarner Ithaca LLC, a Delaware company
Represented By: Katherine Lynn Pullen
Represented By: Brian D. Wassom
Represented By: Devin W. Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?