Saldana v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kelly Saldana
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv14095
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Avern Cohn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/14/2019 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/17/2019 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MVer)
February 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 2/11/2019 (MVer)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph L. Falzon appearing on behalf of Kelly Saldana (Falzon, Joseph)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 2/11/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
January 2, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Wright, Brian)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Third Judicial Circuit Court, case number 18-003561-NF. Receipt No: 0645-7047483 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Wright, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saldana v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Saldana
Represented By: Joseph L. Falzon
Represented By: Lawrence C. Falzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?