Edwards v. Meisner et al
Plaintiff: John D. Edwards
Defendant: Daniel Brightwell, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Frederick Zorn, Habitat for Humanity, Donald Fracassi, Andrew Meisner, Kenson Siver, Etoile Libbett, Nancy Banks, Oakland, County of, Mitchell Simon, Rita Hillman, Southfield, City of, Southfield Non Profit Housing Corporation, Earlene Trayler-Neal, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Lloyd Crews, Ken Siver, Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative, LLC, Michael Mandlebaum and Lora Brantley-Gilbert
Case Number: 2:2019cv10047
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
2 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
3 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and for Sanctions by Nancy Banks, Daniel Brightwell, Lloyd Crews, Donald Fracassi, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Michael Mandlebaum, Kenson Siver, Southfield, City of, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Judgment of Foreclosure, #3 Exhibit Order Granting Summary Disposition, #4 Exhibit Edwards v. Oakland Cty. Treasurer, #5 Exhibit Edwards v. Oakland Cty. Treasurer, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs Prior Complaint, #7 Exhibit Motion for TRO, #8 Exhibit Southfields Response to Motion for TRO, #9 Exhibit SNRIs Response to Motion for TRO, #10 Exhibit Southfields Motion to Dismiss, #11 Exhibit SNRIs Motion to Dismiss, #12 Exhibit Defendant Meisners Motion to Dismiss, #13 Exhibit Photograph of Front of Home, #14 Exhibit Photograph of Kitchen, #15 Exhibit Photograph of Flooded Basement and Trash, #16 Exhibit Photograph of Trash, #17 Exhibit Second Photograph of Kitchen, #18 Exhibit Pegross v. Oakland Cty. Treasurer, #19 Exhibit Ligon v. Kales, #20 Exhibit Loriz v. Connaughton, #21 Exhibit Anderson v. Cty. of Wayne, #22 Exhibit Levi v. Safeway, #23 Exhibit Walsh v. Massachusetts Bd. of Bar Examiners, #24 Exhibit Lewis v. Smith, #25 Exhibit Plaintiffs Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (Knoblock, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis to District Judge Paul D. Borman and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (NAhm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by John D. Edwards. (DPer)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joseph Seward on behalf of Nancy Banks, Daniel Brightwell, Lloyd Crews, Donald Fracassi, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Michael Mandlebaum, Ken Siver, Southfield, City of, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Seward, T.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Knoblock on behalf of Nancy Banks, Daniel Brightwell, Lloyd Crews, Donald Fracassi, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Michael Mandlebaum, Ken Siver, Southfield, City of, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Knoblock, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by John D. Edwards. (DPer)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John D. Edwards against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Meisner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Brightwell
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Frasier
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irv Lowenberg
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Zorn
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Habitat for Humanity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Fracassi
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Meisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenson Siver
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etoile Libbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Banks
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield, City of
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Non Profit Housing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earlene Trayler-Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Ward-Witkowski
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Crews
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Siver
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Neighborhood Revitalization Initiative, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mandlebaum
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lora Brantley-Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?