Pill v. MBT Financial Corp. et al
Plaintiff: David Pill
Defendant: Kristine Barann, Joseph S. Vig, Debra Shah, Tony Scavuzzo, James Deutsch, Michael J. Miller, MBT Financial Corp., Peter Carlton, John Skibski, Douglas Chaffin and Joseph Daly
Case Number: 2:2019cv10076
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Linda V Parker
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *02/06/19*. Designated lead case number is *19-10181*. (DPer)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to consolidate cases. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (DPer)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Defendants of withdrawal of #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Kemp, Matthew)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE and ORDER for Plaintiffs to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 2/6/2019. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Responsive Pleading due by 2/15/19). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by All Defendants. (Kemp, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Kemp, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Kemp on behalf of All Defendants. (Kemp, Matthew)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Dillon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dillon, Thomas)
January 9, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SOso)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Pill against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7058415 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kings County, NY - County Where Action Arose: Monroe, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Monroe, MI. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Document Continuation Plaintiff Certification, #3 Document Continuation Summons, #4 Document Continuation Summons List) (Abb, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pill v. MBT Financial Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Barann
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph S. Vig
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Shah
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Scavuzzo
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Deutsch
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Miller
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBT Financial Corp.
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Carlton
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Skibski
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Chaffin
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Daly
Represented By: Thomas P. Dillon
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pill
Represented By: Robert J. Abb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?