Honey, Jr. v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlton Honey, Jr.
Defendant: Citibank, N.A., Prosper Marketplace, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, First National Bank of Omaha, Bank of America, N.A., American Express and TD Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10098
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of Citibank, N.A.. (Gottlieb, Amy)
March 7, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by TD Bank, N.A.. (Nafziger, Verlin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 29 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by TD Bank, N.A. (Nafziger, Verlin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Verlin R. Nafziger on behalf of TD Bank, N.A.. (Nafziger, Verlin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Carlton Honey, Jr. Settlement re American Express National Bank, only (Nitzkin, Gary)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc. with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Gershwin A. Drain and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen to District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch)
February 13, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
February 7, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. First National Bank of Omaha served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Nitzkin, Gary)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time for Prosper Marketplace Inc. to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal,, ( Response due by 2/20/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (Morrissey, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James Joseph Morrissey on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc.. (Morrissey, James)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew O. Stromquist on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc.. (Stromquist, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by First National Bank of Omaha (Rooney, Cory)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by First National Bank of Omaha. (Rooney, Cory)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Citibank, N.A. served on 1/24/2019, answer due 2/14/2019. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant, Bank of America to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal, ( Response due by 2/18/2019) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Rheaume, Thomas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Kolkmeyer on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Prosper Marketplace, Inc. served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. American Express served on 1/2/2018, answer due 1/23/2018. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Trans Union, LLC served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Bank of America, N.A. served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Nitzkin, Gary)
January 11, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant TD Bank, N.A.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal, (Policchio, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Nettleingham on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Nettleingham, Brian)
January 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
January 11, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: James L. Policchio re #1 Notice of Removal,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SOso)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Rang on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Rang, Laura)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transunion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Policchio on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (Policchio, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from 17th District Court, MI, case number 18-75215-GC. Receipt No: 0645-7061044 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint To Trans Union, LLC, #4 Exhibit C-Bank Of America's Consent To Removal) (Policchio, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honey, Jr. v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Honey, Jr.
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew O. Stromquist
Represented By: James Joseph Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: James L. Policchio
Represented By: Laura K. Rang
Represented By: Brian A. Nettleingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Cory J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle L. Kolkmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Verlin R. Nafziger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?