TGINN Jets, LLC et al v. Meathe et al

Plaintiff: TGINN Jets, LLC, Lockwood Family Investment Limited Partnership and J.R. Slavik & Associates II
Defendant: Hampton Ridge Properties, LLC and Cullan Meathe
Case Number: 2:2019cv10105
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Answer (Free) Plaintiffs' Response to Defs' Answer to Order to Show Cause by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (Bachand, Donald)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Order to Show Cause by All Defendants. (Lijoi, Costanzo)
February 5, 2019 RE-Set Deadline: Show Cause Response due by 2/8/2019 (LBar)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for defendants Hampton Ridge Properties, LLC and Cullan Meathe to Show Cause why this case should not be remanded to Oakland County Circuit Court for lack of federal jurisdiction - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
January 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2018-168891-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7061960 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Lijoi, Costanzo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TGINN Jets, LLC et al v. Meathe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton Ridge Properties, LLC
Represented By: Costanzo Z. Lijoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cullan Meathe
Represented By: Costanzo Z. Lijoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TGINN Jets, LLC
Represented By: C. William Garratt
Represented By: Donald R. Bachand, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lockwood Family Investment Limited Partnership
Represented By: C. William Garratt
Represented By: Donald R. Bachand, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R. Slavik & Associates II
Represented By: C. William Garratt
Represented By: Donald R. Bachand, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?