Svoboda v Massachusetts Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Trustee Jeffrey Svoboda, Jr
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10115
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Anthony P Patti
1 Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Response to #1 Complaint. Response due by 3/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Response to #1 Complaint. Response due by 2/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. McCarthy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McCarthy, Daniel)
January 14, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Massachusetts Mutual Insurance Company from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2018-170318-CK. Receipt No: 0645-7063370 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hindelang, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Svoboda v Massachusetts Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Hindelang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Jeffrey Svoboda, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?