Quinn v. Toyota Motor Corporation U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Quinn
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Distributors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10246
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 2/27/2019: Counsel to participate in settlement negotiations. Scheduling Conference to be held 7/17/2019 02:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow if case is not resolved. (MLan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2019 11:30 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Bickerdt, Carmen)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Bickerdt, Carmen)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Bickerdt, Carmen)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Correct Filing Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. (Bickerdt, Carmen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Bickerdt, Carmen)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. (Bickerdt, Carmen)
January 25, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants Toyota Motor Corporation U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Distributors, Inc., d/b/a Toyota Motor Corporation. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Error, (Bickerdt, Carmen)
January 25, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE of error directed to: Carmen M. Bickerdt re #1 Notice of Removal. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. Toyota Motor Distributers, Inc., d/b/a Toyota Motor Corporation needs to be added. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DPer)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2018-169980-NO. [FEE PAID; RECEIPT NO. 0645-7080082] Fee waiver included in accordance with 28 USC 1916 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Amended Complaints, #3 Exhibit B - Second Summons and Amended Complaints, #4 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court of Defendants' Removal of Action to United States District Court) (Bickerdt, Carmen) Modified on 1/25/2019 (DPer). Modified on 1/29/2019 (MLan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn v. Toyota Motor Corporation U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Carmen M. Bickerdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Carmen M. Bickerdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: Carmen M. Bickerdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Carmen M. Bickerdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Quinn
Represented By: Donald H. Dawson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?