Simmons v. 250 West Larned, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Twana Simmons
Defendant: 250 West Larned, LLC, Bob Lambert and Detroit Foundation Hotel
Case Number: 2:2019cv10282
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINES: (Discovery due by 10/20/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/20/2021, Jury Trial set for 5/18/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
August 10, 2020 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 8/12/2020 is Cancelled. Parties have agreed to mediate case. (JCur)
July 30, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: **ATTORNEYS ONLY** Status Conference set for 8/12/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (JCur) **HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM VIDEO--THE COURT WILL EMAIL INSTRUCTIONS AND CONNECTION LINK SEPARATELY*
July 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: ZOOM Status Conference held on 7/28/2020. Disposition: Counsel will update the court if they have agreed on a mediator on or before: (ZOOM Status Conference set 8/12/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman). (Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (JCur)
July 21, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: **ATTORNEYS ONLY** ZOOM Status Conference set for 7/28/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (JCur) **HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE VIA ZOOM VIDEO--THE COURT WILL EMAIL INSTRUCTIONS AND CONNECTION LINK SEPARATELY**
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER extending dates: (Discovery due by 8/20/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/5/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2021 01:30 PM, Jury Trial set for 3/2/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for substitution of counsel. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (DPer)
April 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by All Defendants of Substitution (Wymer, Martin)
March 5, 2020 Remark: Attorney Richard Mack informed the court by email that the parties are exploring ADR and that if the case does not settle within the next two weeks, a stipulated order extending scheduling order dates will be submitted. (JCur)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER postponing deadlines: (Discovery due by 3/20/2020; ADR Notification due by 5/20/2020). Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/5/2020; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/29/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 01:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 10/6/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting re #17 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery filed by Twana Simmons an amended scheduling order will be issued.Entered by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Hearing (Mack, Richard)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Mack, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANTS' WITNESS LIST by 250 West Larned, LLC, Bob Lambert (Wymer, Martin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST by Twana Simmons (Champa, Judith)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/20/2019; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/7/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2020 01:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 6/23/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Wymer, Martin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN (JCur)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Champa on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Champa, Judith)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Wymer, Martin)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER re #7 Amended Complaint, #8 Notice to Withdraw #2 Motion. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
March 5, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 3/6/2019 is Cancelled #5 - motion was withdrawn. (JCur)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bob Lambert of withdrawal of #2 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint . (Wymer, Martin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Mack, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Wymer, Martin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING TO BE HELD AT WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY LAW SCHOOL on #2 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (Refer to image for additional details) (JCur)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by 250 West Larned, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Larned West Associates, LLC for 250 West Larned, LLC. (Wymer, Martin)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Wymer, Martin)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Bob Lambert. (Wymer, Martin)
January 30, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 18-015640-CD. Receipt No: 0645-7084799 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Initial Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Removal) (Wymer, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. 250 West Larned, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 250 West Larned, LLC
Represented By: Martin T. Wymer
Represented By: Michael Scott McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Lambert
Represented By: Martin T. Wymer
Represented By: Michael Scott McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Foundation Hotel
Represented By: Martin T. Wymer
Represented By: Michael Scott McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twana Simmons
Represented By: Richard G. Mack
Represented By: Judith A. Champa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?