Smith v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Martin Smith
Defendant: Amanda Menchinger, Wallace E. Smith, Joan E. Smith and E&E Manufacturing Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10330
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
2 Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS TIME TO FILE ANAMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDINGDIVERSITY JURISDICTION. Amended Complaint / Memorandum of Authorities Supporting Jurisdiction due by 4/5/2019 and Response due by 4/12/2019 Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. (Amended Complaint / Memorandum of Authorities Supporting Jurisdiction due by 4/3/2019 and Response due by 4/10/2019) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Morgan on behalf of All Defendants. (Morgan, Justin)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Holland v. Kraatz, #4 Exhibit C - City of Grand Rapids, #5 Exhibit D - Jones v. McCormick, #6 Exhibit E - Berger v. Katz) (Horton, William) Modified on 3/13/2019 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL"]
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT (Dkt. 13). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Favaro on behalf of All Defendants. (Favaro, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 [STRICKEN] MOTION to Dismiss by E&E Manufacturing Corporation, Inc., Amanda Menchinger, Joan E. Smith, Wallace E. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Holland v. Kraatz, #4 Exhibit C - City of Grand Rapids v. F&M Foods, Inc., #5 Exhibit D - Jones v. McCormick, #6 Exhibit E - Berger v. Katz) (Horton, William) Modified on 3/8/2019 (DWor). [DOCUMENT ENTITLED "MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL"] Modified on 3/12/2019 (Sandusky, K).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by E&E Manufacturing Corporation, Inc., Amanda Menchinger, Joan E. Smith, Wallace E. Smith (Horton, William)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by E&E Manufacturing Corporation, Inc., Amanda Menchinger, Joan E. Smith, Wallace E. Smith. (Horton, William)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. E&E Manufacturing Corporation, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Williamson, Ian)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Amanda Menchinger served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Williamson, Ian)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Joan E. Smith served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Williamson, Ian)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wallace E. Smith served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Williamson, Ian)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of RECUSAL and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (NAhm)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James A. Buster appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Buster, James)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerard V. Mantese appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mantese, Gerard)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7091269 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Williamson, Ian)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Menchinger
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: William H. Horton
Represented By: Justin Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace E. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: William H. Horton
Represented By: Justin Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan E. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: William H. Horton
Represented By: Justin Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&E Manufacturing Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Favaro
Represented By: William H. Horton
Represented By: Justin Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Smith
Represented By: Ian M. Williamson
Represented By: James A. Buster
Represented By: Gerard V. Mantese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?