XG Security Services, LLC
Appellee: XG Security Services, LLC
Appellant: GPS Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv10379
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Extending Discovery Period and Amending Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order. (Expert Witness due by 4/30/2019; Discovery due by 5/31/2019; and Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 6/30/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. This Status Conference replaces the Scheduling Conference set for this date and time. (EKar)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
March 28, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Complete Record on Appeal (VLun)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Designated Bankruptcy Record (VLun)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND Discovery Period and Amend Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order by All Defendants. (Scheinfield, Aaron)
March 19, 2019 Remark - Copies of Order #5 served on Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court and Judge Maria L. Oxholm. (MacKay, K)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by XG Security Services, LLC, XG Security Services, LLC. (Darnell, Donald)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for XG Security Services, LLC to Show Cause why GPS Hospitality's Motion to Withdraw Reference #1 Should not be Granted. Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BGar)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Motion to Withdraw Reference (VLun)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by GPS Hospitality, LLC. (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XG Security Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: XG Security Services, LLC
Represented By: Donald C. Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: GPS Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Aaron J. Scheinfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?