Martin v. Pacific Union Financial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Delores Martin
Defendant: Pacific Union Financial, LLC and Proctor Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10380
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
1 Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Time for Defendant Pacific Union Financial, LLC to Answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, (Response due by 4/18/2019). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, (Response due by 4/18/2019). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Time for Defendant Pacific Union Financial, LLC to Answer or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, (Response due by 3/20/2019). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Pacific Union Financial, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Pacific Union Financial, LLC. (Lynch, John)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Lynch on behalf of Pacific Union Financial, LLC. (Lynch, John)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Kundmueller on behalf of Pacific Union Financial, LLC. (Kundmueller, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance, #7 Notice of Appearance, #4 Summons Issued, #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, #2 Notice of Appearance by Delores Martin upon Mr. Cooper (Drake, Eleanor)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Proctor Financial, Inc. served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Drake, Eleanor)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Pacific Union Financial, LLC served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Drake, Eleanor)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C. Hashmall on behalf of Delores Martin. (Hashmall, Joseph)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Michelle Drake on behalf of Delores Martin. (Drake, Eleanor)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Proctor Financial, Inc.* (LGra)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Pacific Union Financial, LLC* (LGra)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of Delores Martin. (Bressack, Darryl)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of Delores Martin. (Fink, Nathan)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Delores Martin against Pacific Union Financial, LLC, Proctor Financial, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7097695 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Fink, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Pacific Union Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Martin
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Represented By: Eleanor Michelle Drake
Represented By: Joseph C. Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Union Financial, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Kundmueller
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proctor Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?