Dolores et al v. General R.V. Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Odelia Dolores and George Dolores
Defendant: Forest River, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. and Cornerstone United, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10413
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 *CORRECTION* Reset Deadlines as to #19 #20 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 4/26/2019 (MBea)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING on #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 3/26/2019 Replies due by 5/17/2019 Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Cornerstone United, Inc. (Dolenga, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER of Attorney Substitution with stipulation. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (SSch)
March 27, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Forest River, Inc.. (Papageorge, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by General R.V. Center, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-16) (Dolenga, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cornerstone United, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5) (Dolenga, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Dolenga on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Dolenga, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Schwartz on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Schwartz, Nicholas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Schwartz on behalf of Cornerstone United, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc.. (Schwartz, Nicholas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Dolenga on behalf of Cornerstone United, Inc., General R.V. Center, Inc.. (Dolenga, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by U.S. Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Inc. for U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Powell, Matthew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Powell, Matthew)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew L. Powell appearing on behalf of U.S. Bank, N.A. (Powell, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General R.V. Center, Inc. (Dolenga, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Extending response by defendant Forest River to #1 Complaint per stipulation #9 Response due by 3/27/2019 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION (Joint) for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint by Forest River, Inc. (Papageorge, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Forest River, Inc. (Papageorge, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Papageorge on behalf of Forest River, Inc.. (Papageorge, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Taub, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Forest River, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Taub, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. General R.V. Center, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Taub, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Cornerstone United, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Taub, Adam)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
February 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7102828 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out-of-State - County Where Action Arose: Out-of-State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: US District Court Middle District Florida, 18-00981, Judge Marcia Morales Howard] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court Middle District Florida, 18-00981, Judge Marcia Morales Howard] (Taub, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolores et al v. General R.V. Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Papageorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General R.V. Center, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael D. Dolenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael D. Dolenga
Represented By: Matthew L. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone United, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael D. Dolenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odelia Dolores
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Dolores
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?