Morgan v. Concentra Health Services, Inc. a Nevada Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Morgan
Defendant: John Nelson, M.D., Concentra Health Services, Inc. a Nevada Corporation and Occupational Health Centers of Michigan, P.C. d/b/a Concentra Medical Centerss, a Michigan Corproration
Case Number: 2:2019cv10475
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Mona, Jonathan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN (JCur)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Occupational Health Centers of Michigan, P.C. d/b/a Concentra Medical Centerss, a Michigan Corproration identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical, Inc. for Occupational Health Centers of Michigan, P.C. d/b/a Concentra Medical Centerss, a Michigan Corproration. (Mona, Jonathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Concentra Health Services, Inc. a Nevada Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Select Medical, Inc. for Concentra Health Services, Inc. a Nevada Corporation. (Mona, Jonathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Mona, Jonathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Karen W. Magdich appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Magdich, Karen)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan P. Mona appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Mona, Jonathan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *John Nelson, M.D.* (LGra)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Occupational Health Centers of Michigan, P.C. d/b/a Concentra Medical Centerss, a Michigan Corproration* (LGra)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Concentra Health Services, Inc. a Nevada Corporation * (LGra)
February 19, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint and Affidavit of Merit filed by Stephen Morgan against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7111543 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Allegheny - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Merit - Mark Berman, MD) (Walsh, Leon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Concentra Health Services, Inc. a Nevada Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nelson, M.D.
Represented By: Jonathan P. Mona
Represented By: Karen W. Magdich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentra Health Services, Inc. a Nevada Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan P. Mona
Represented By: Karen W. Magdich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occupational Health Centers of Michigan, P.C. d/b/a Concentra Medical Centerss, a Michigan Corproration
Represented By: Jonathan P. Mona
Represented By: Karen W. Magdich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Morgan
Represented By: Leon M. Walsh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?