Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.55.112.116

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.55.112.116
Case Number: 2:2019cv10491
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Protective Order by John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.55.112.116. (Antonelli, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING #7 MOTION for Protective Order for Failure to Properly Seek Concurrence pursuant to L.R. 7.1. The movant must ascertain whether the contemplated motion, or request under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(A), will be opposed. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Protective Order by John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.55.112.116. (Antonelli, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey Antonelli appearing on behalf of John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.55.112.116 (Antonelli, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Requiring Notification to "John Doe" Defendant. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
February 20, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser) (Bernier, Joel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.55.112.116 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7114250 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.55.112.116
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.55.112.116
Represented By: Jeffrey Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel A. Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?