Coleman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Brian Coleman
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv10502
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
0 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
1 Judge: Denise Page Hood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs AMENDED by Brian Coleman. (Corr, Vicki)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Brian Coleman for violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 requiring that papers be signed by either the attorney or the party as appropriate. Counsel was notified of the error, but the matter was not promptly corrected. If plaintiff is a minor or has been found by adjudication to necessitate the supervision or oversight of another (e.g. guardian, conservator, etc.), the title of any such person signing a paper to be filed with the court on plaintiff's behalf must be noted next to the signature and a copy of the order appointing said individual must be attached as an exhibit to the subject document. Review of this Order is governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72 and Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (SOso)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 [STRICKEN] APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Brian Coleman. (Corr, Vicki) Modified on 4/9/2019 (THal).
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brian Coleman against Commissioner Social Security. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Corr, Vicki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Coleman
Represented By: Vicki J. Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?