Faford v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Gilbert N. Faford, II
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10523
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Canadian National Railway for Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (O'Donnell, Mary)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (O'Donnell, Mary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Wilensky, Benjamin)
February 21, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company* (SOso)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilensky on behalf of Gilbert N. Faford, II. (Wilensky, Benjamin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gilbert N. Faford, II against Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7117630 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Pearlman, Arvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faford v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: Mary C. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert N. Faford, II
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilensky
Represented By: Arvin J. Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?