Isabelle Hall Company v. Premier Commission, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Isabelle Hall Company
Defendant: Jennifer S. Zachary, Premier Commission, LLC and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv10580
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert H Cleland
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub in Courtroom 602 (LHos)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT and REFERENCE to a United States Magistrate Judge to Conduct All Proceedings. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (SSch)
April 11, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 4/11/2019 is Cancelled. Parties consent to transfer case to Magistrate Judge Majzoub (LWag)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by United States of America . (Bednar, Philip)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Bednar, Philip)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 10:30 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Crossclaim with Affirmative Defenses Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim; with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by Premier Commission, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot G. Crowder on behalf of Premier Commission, LLC. (Crowder, Elliot)
February 26, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM filed by United States of America against Premier Commission, LLC by United States of America. (Bednar, Philip)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Untied States of America from Circuit Court for the County of Oakland, case number 2019-171515-CB. No Fee Required - US Government. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State-court pleadings) (Bednar, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isabelle Hall Company v. Premier Commission, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer S. Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Commission, LLC
Represented By: Elliot G. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Philip Leonard Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabelle Hall Company
Represented By: Kellie Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?