Dillard v. Wayne County District Court et al
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Dillard
Defendant: Terrance K. Boyle, Nancy M Blount, Irma J Chenevert, Wayne County Circuit Court and Wayne County District Court
Case Number: 2:2019cv10582
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 COPY of #7 Order mailed to Eddie L. Dillard and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
April 8, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Eddie L. Dillard 254178 at COOPER STREET CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 3100 COOPER STREET, JACKSON, MI 49201. (BSau)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge. (BSau)
April 3, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Order on Eddie L. Dillard Pris. No. 255178 at 3100 COOPER STREET, JACKSON, MI 49201. (EBut)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eddie L. Dillard re #4 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (SSch)
March 26, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Eddie L. Dillard 255178 at COOPER STREET CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 3100 COOPER STREET, JACKSON, MI 49201. (BSau)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (BSau)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 COPY of notice, consent, and reference of a civil action to a magistrate judge, etc., mailed to Eddie L. Dillard and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eddie L. Dillard against All Defendants. (NAhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. Wayne County District Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance K. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy M Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma J Chenevert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?