Hewitt-El v. Parish
Petitioner: Jonathan David Hewitt-El
Respondent: Warden Les Parish
Case Number: 2:2019cv10652
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Christensen-Brown on behalf of Les Parish. (Christensen-Brown, Andrea)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Response due by 10/8/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (LGra)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus on Les Parish an AG (LGra)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jonathan David Hewitt-El against Les Parish, Receipt No: 0645-7136078 - Fee: $ 5. (Grove, Chari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewitt-El v. Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan David Hewitt-El
Represented By: Chari K. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Les Parish
Represented By: Andrea M. Christensen-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?