Slaven et al v. Kenjaev
Plaintiff: David Slaven and Kendra Slaven
Defendant: Erkin Kenjaev and INTERLAND, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10825
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
2 Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Plagens, Kevin)
June 4, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Plagens appearing on behalf of INTERLAND, INC. (Plagens, Kevin)
May 21, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (Corrects Case Management Order, setting trial as a bench trial) (Sandusky, K)
May 15, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued for *INTERLAND, INC.* (DWor)
May 14, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for INTERLAND, INC.. (Serafini, Phillip)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Serafini, Phillip)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Settlement Conference set for 1/9/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Grand : Settlement Conference to be scheduled within the 30-day period before the deadline for the Joint Final Pretrial Order. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/23/2019, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 11/6/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith, and Bench Trial set for 4/20/2020 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Sandusky, K)
April 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/23/2019. (Sandusky, K)
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Plagens, Kevin)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip S. Serafini on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Serafini, Phillip)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants (Plagens, Kevin)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference. TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 04:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when allparties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by All Defendants (Plagens, Kevin)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Plagens, Kevin)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kevin J. Plagens appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Plagens, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM re #3 Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, Affidavit of Service by Erkin Kenjaev (Plagens, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM re #4 Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Erkin Kenjaev (Plagens, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM re #3 Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, Summons and Complaint by Erkin Kenjaev (Plagens, Kevin)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SSch)
March 20, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 18-015703-NI. Receipt No: 0645-7161284 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Proof of Service of Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Exhibit D-Correspondence to Plaintiff's Counsel) (Plagens, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaven et al v. Kenjaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Slaven
Represented By: Darren K. Legato
Represented By: Phillip S. Serafini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Slaven
Represented By: Darren K. Legato
Represented By: Phillip S. Serafini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erkin Kenjaev
Represented By: Kevin J. Plagens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERLAND, INC.
Represented By: Kevin J. Plagens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?