Francis et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Darrin Degrand, Wesley Won, Joseph Sierchio, Howard Young, Michael Plafker, Richard Francis and Dennis Speerly
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11044
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Pitt, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Leopold on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Leopold, Theodore)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING on #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson in a Courtroom to be Determined. (SPin)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying #10 Motion to Suspend Deadlines. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
June 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson in Chambers 1051. Statements are due 7/30/2019. (SPin)
June 17, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 6/26/2019 at 11:30 AM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by General Motors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Douglas, Stephanie)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION General Motor's Motion to Suspend Deadlines Pending Transfer and Consolidation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rivers, Beth)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION General Motor's Motion to Suspend Deadlines Pending Transfer and Consolidation by General Motors, LLC. (Douglas, Stephanie)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney Danielle Naiman Kohn on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Kohn, Brittney)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Alexander Levine on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Levine, Jared)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T. Sooy on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Sooy, Kathleen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Douglas, Stephanie)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. General Motors, LLC waiver sent on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Rivers, Beth)
April 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *General Motors, LLC* (DAll)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth M. Rivers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rivers, Beth)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) filed by All Plaintiffs against General Motors, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7192296 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Pitt, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Degrand
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Represented By: Beth M. Rivers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Won
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Represented By: Beth M. Rivers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sierchio
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Represented By: Beth M. Rivers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Young
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Represented By: Beth M. Rivers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Plafker
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Represented By: Beth M. Rivers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Francis
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Represented By: Beth M. Rivers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Speerly
Represented By: Michael L. Pitt
Represented By: Beth M. Rivers
Represented By: Theodore J. Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Brittney Danielle Naiman Kohn
Represented By: Jared Alexander Levine
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Represented By: Kathleen T. Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?