Krueger v. Citibank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Randal Krueger
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11050
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Avern Cohn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
April 18, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Scheduling Order, on Randal Krueger (MVer)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/19/2019 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/19/2019 Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (Refer to image for additional dates) (MVer)
April 11, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citibank, N.A. from 35th District Court, case number 19V1045SC. Receipt No: 0645-7192897 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gottlieb, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krueger v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?