Frazier v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: Terrance Frazier
Defendant: NANCY A BERRYHILL
Case Number: 2:2019cv11097
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Patricia T Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace H. Lawrence on behalf of NANCY A BERRYHILL. (Lawrence, Candace)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *NANCY A BERRYHILL * (KCas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Letter, FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Terrance Frazier - Receipt No. DET122720 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Adopting #4 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Terrance Frazier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
April 17, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Referral of Social Security Case to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (DWor)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Terrance Frazier. (Lamey, Wesley)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terrance Frazier against NANCY A BERRYHILL. Plaintiff requests summons issued. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Lamey, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Frazier
Represented By: Wesley James Lamey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A BERRYHILL
Represented By: Candace H. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?