Muhammad v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: Dante K. Muhammad and Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development and Government National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv11117
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Government National Mortgage Association. (DPer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Correction. Voluntary dismissal was filed on the wrong case. (MVer)
May 1, 2019 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]. (DPer)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued for *Government National Mortgage Association, U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development* (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (DPer)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLETE SERVICE DOCUMENTS AND FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE U.S. MARSHAL Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORRECTED ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
April 22, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order on Petition/Request/Application, #7 Order on Dante K. Muhammad at 24604 Templar Avenue, Southfield, MI 48075. (MVer)
April 22, 2019 NOTICE of Error re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Wrong or incomplete PDF image was uploaded. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (MVer)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Dante K. Muhammad. (DPer)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dante K. Muhammad against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante K. Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante K. Muhammad [E-Filer]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?