Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 23.117.52.196
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 23.117.52.196
Case Number: 2:2019cv11257
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sean F Cox
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Quash by John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 23.117.52.196. (HIRMIZ, SHAWN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAWN F HIRMIZ on behalf of John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 23.117.52.196. (HIRMIZ, SHAWN)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #5 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser) (Bernier, Joel)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 23.117.52.196 with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-7220399 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 23.117.52.196
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel A. Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 23.117.52.196
Represented By: SHAWN F HIRMIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?