Rubio et al v. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings, Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Shields, Laura Shimko, Sigfredo Rubio, Xin Wang, Margaret Rizzo and Jami S Oliver
Defendant: TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., American Honda Motor Co., Inc., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11295
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Linda V Parker
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
3 Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Continuing Responsive Pleading Deadline. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant FCA US LLC to Respond to Class Action Complaint. ( Answer due by 7/27/2019) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas L. Azar, Jr appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Azar, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathy A. Wisniewski appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Wisniewski, Kathy)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FCA US LLC served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Kickham, Edward)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Defendants ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. and TRW Automotive U.S. LLCS Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint ( Response due by 7/1/2019). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. (Letzmann, Matthew)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert C. Donovan on behalf of ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Donovan, Herbert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Letzmann on behalf of ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Letzmann, Matthew)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Regarding Certification Requirements. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Clay Barnett, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barnett, H.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Daniel Miles, III on behalf of Jami S Oliver, Margaret Rizzo, Sigfredo Rubio, Andrea Shields, Laura Shimko, Xin Wang. (Miles, W.)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Ferri on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ferri, Daniel)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tangren on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tangren, John)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Levitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Levitt, Adam)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (NAhm)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory D. Hanley appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hanley, Gregory)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamie K. Warrow appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Warrow, Jamie)
May 6, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *American Honda Motor Co., Inc., FCA US LLC, TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.* (DWor)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7225973 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): U.S.D.C. for the E. D. Michigan, 2:19-cv-11215, Judge Hon. Mark A. Goldsmith] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint) (Kickham, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubio et al v. ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings, Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Shields
Represented By: Edward F. Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Jamie K. Warrow
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Gregory D. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Shimko
Represented By: Edward F. Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Jamie K. Warrow
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Gregory D. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Edward F. Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Jamie K. Warrow
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Gregory D. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xin Wang
Represented By: Edward F. Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Jamie K. Warrow
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Gregory D. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Rizzo
Represented By: Edward F. Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Jamie K. Warrow
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Gregory D. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jami S Oliver
Represented By: Edward F. Kickham, Jr.
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Jamie K. Warrow
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Gregory D. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Automotive U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Letzmann
Represented By: Herbert C. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Kathy A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Thomas L. Azar, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?