Day v. General Motors Company et al
Plaintiff: Roy A. Day and Roy A. Day [E-Filer]
Defendant: General Motors Company and Mary T. Barra
Case Number: 2:2019cv11311
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION by ROY A. DAY - USM-285 FORM AND SUMMONS USM-285 FORM AND SUMMONS FOR GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY filed by Roy A. Day [E-Filer] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation USM-285 FORM - GMC, #2 Document Continuation SUMMONS - GMC) (Day [E-Filer], Roy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION by ROY A. DAY - USM-285 FORM AND SUMMONS USM-285 FORM AND SUMMONS FOR MARY T. BARRA filed by Roy A. Day [E-Filer] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation USM-285 FORM - BARRA, #2 Document Continuation SUMMONS) (Day [E-Filer], Roy)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve #1 Complaint - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: #9 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS filed by Roy A. Day [E-Filer]. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION by ROY A. DAY PLAINTIFF'S FORST NOTICE OF FILING filed by Roy A. Day [E-Filer] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ROY A. DAY'S MAY 23, 2019 LETTER TO CLERK, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT "1" FOR ROY A. DAY'S MAY 23, 2019 LETTER, #3 Exhibit PRO SE FILER FORM, #4 Document Continuation CLERK'S COVER LETTER) (Day [E-Filer], Roy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS by Roy A. Day [E-Filer]. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation CLERK'S COVER LETTER, #2 Document Continuation PROPOSED ORDER FILED PURSUANT TO THE RULES) (Day [E-Filer], Roy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED by Roy A. Day [E-Filer] AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT "500" - CATHY DAVIDSON, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT "501-A - MARY BARRA, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT "501" - B - EXHIBIT "1" FOR EX. 501-A, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT "502" - A - MARY BARRA, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT "502" - B - EXHIBIT "1" FOR EXHIBIT "502-A, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT "502" - C - EXHIBIT "A" FOR EX. 502-A, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT "503" - ROY A. DAY'S EMAIL REPLY, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT "504" - ROY A. DAY'S EMAIL REPLY, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT "505" - LEETER TO CATHY DAVID AND JEREMY WOODARD, #10 Document Continuation CLERK'S COVER LETTER) (Day [E-Filer], Roy)
May 28, 2019 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Roy A. Day [E-Filer]. (DTyl)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Roy A. Day [E-Filer] (DTyl)
May 22, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #6 Order on Roy A. Day at P.O. Box 33, Tarpon Springs, FL 34688-0033. (LSau)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Roy A. Day. (DPer)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Roy A. Day against defendants (DPer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. General Motors Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy A. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy A. Day [E-Filer]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary T. Barra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?