Enhanced Capital HTC FundI, LLC et al v. Duckett
Plaintiff: Enhanced Capital HTC FundI, LLC and 678 Selden, LLC
Defendant: Brandon Duckett and Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11324
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Brandon Duckett. (Stotland, Alexander)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. Response due by 7/1/2019 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Permitting Substitution of Attorneys. #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney OSIPOV BIGELMAN, P.C. and JEFFREY H. BIGELMAN, ESQ filed by Osipov Bigelman, P.C.., Attorney Jeffrey H. Bigelman terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Brandon Duckett: Alexander Stotland added. (Stotland, Alexander)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney OSIPOV BIGELMAN, P.C. and JEFFREY H. BIGELMAN, ESQ by Osipov Bigelman, P.C.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey H. Bigelman on behalf of Brandon Duckett. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint. Response due by 6/24/2019 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING #4 Stipulation filed by Brandon Duckett. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
June 2, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, TO EXTEND DATE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Brandon Duckett (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brandon Duckett served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Donnelly, Michael)
May 7, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Brandon Duckett* (DWor)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Brandon Duckett. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7228097 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Donnelly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enhanced Capital HTC FundI, LLC et al v. Duckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Duckett
Represented By: Alexander Stotland
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enhanced Capital HTC FundI, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 678 Selden, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?