v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Detroit Field Office Director et al
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, Director of, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Director of, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Detroit Field Office Director and United States Attorney General
Petitioner: Fouad AWAR
Respondent: MATTHEW ALBENCE, WILLIAM P BARR, KEVIN MCALEENAN and Rebecca Adducci
Case Number: 2:2019cv11330
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS and Ordering Petitioner Released from ICE Custody. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
June 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/24/2019. (MLan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/24/2019 11:30 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Counsel are directed to forward their phone numbers to the court at (313) 234-5180 by 6/24/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (MLan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Deportation,, Petitioner's Reply to Respondents' Response in Opposition filed by Fouad AWAR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit Exhibit N) (Sproull, Glenn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Deportation,, by MATTHEW ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, KEVIN MCALEENAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Deportation Officer Zywica) (Goulding, Jonathan)
May 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 5/15/2019: Counsel to confer and report status and/or file Responses/Supplemental pleadings by 6/10/2019. (MLan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Goulding on behalf of Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, KEVIN MCALEENAN. (Goulding, Jonathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kevin McAleenan, Acting Director, DHS served on 05/10/2019. (Sproull, Glenn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Matthew Albence, Acting Director, ICE served on 05/10/2019. (Sproull, Glenn)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Rebecca Adducci, Detroit Field Office Director, ICE ERO served on 05/10/2019. (Sproull, Glenn)
May 10, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Notice to Appear on Assistant United States Attorney Jonathan Goulding by email at jonathan.goulding@usdoj.gov and also by telephone. (MLan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 RE-NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 5/15/2019 03:30 PM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Conference on 5/15/2019 is CANCELLED. (MLan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 5/15/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. Counsel for petitioner shall contact counsel for the respondents and notify the court with progress in identifying respondents' counsel. (MLan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm)
May 8, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for MATTHEW ALBENCE, Rebecca Adducci, WILLIAM P BARR, KEVIN MCALEENAN. (Sproull, Glenn)
May 8, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 5.00 by Fouad AWAR - Receipt No. DET122455 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan)
May 7, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendants Rebecca Adducci, MATTHEW ALBENCE, KEVIN MCALEENAN, WILLIAM P BARR. Reason: Parties were omitted and incorrectly added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Deportation,, (Sproull, Glenn)
May 7, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 5/14/2019 (NAhm)
May 7, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Glenn Eric Sproull re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Deportation,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Regarding Deportation filed by Fouad AWAR against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-213, 2006, #2 Exhibit Notice to Appear, 2006, #3 Exhibit Notice Admin Order, 2006, #4 Exhibit Admin Order, 2006, #5 Exhibit 90-day Review, 2006, #6 Exhibit 180-day Review, 2007, #7 Exhibit Order Supervision, 2007, #8 Exhibit Release Notice, 2007, #9 Exhibit Notice to Appear, 2018, #10 Exhibit Final Order Removal, 2018, #11 Exhibit 180-day Continue Detention, 2019) (Sproull, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Detroit Field Office Director et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW ALBENCE
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P BARR
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rebecca Adducci
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fouad AWAR
Represented By: Glenn Eric Sproull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, Director of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Director of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Detroit Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?