Naef v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of et al

Plaintiff: Ann Fawzi Naef Naef
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director and Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary
Case Number: 2:2019cv11359
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint, filed by Ann Fawzi Naef Naef. Response due by 9/11/2019 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Goulding on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director. (Goulding, Jonathan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Defendants. (Abrutyn, Russell)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. USCIS served on 05/13/2019. (Abrutyn, Russell)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. DHS served on 05/13/2019. (Abrutyn, Russell)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney General served on 05/13/2019. (Abrutyn, Russell)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (NAhm)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * [RE-ISSUED] (NAhm)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) [CORRECTED SUMMONSES ARE RE-ISSUED] Modified on 5/8/2019 (NAhm).
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and Injunctive Relief filed by Ann Fawzi Naef Naef against Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7231572 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Naturalization interview notice, #3 Exhibit B - Naturalization interview cancellation notice, #4 Exhibit C - Approval of asylum application, #5 Exhibit D - Approval of adjustment of status application, #6 Exhibit E - USCIS Ombudsman inquiries, #7 Exhibit F - Congressional inquiries, #8 Exhibit G - USCIS processing times) (Abrutyn, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naef v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Fawzi Naef Naef
Represented By: Russell R. Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director of
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, Acting Secretary
Represented By: Jonathan Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?