Vescio-Baldwin v. Allstate Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Ann Vescio-Baldwin
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11361
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Miller, Charles)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Deposition, #4 Exhibit 3 - Discovery Requests and Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 4 - Subpoenas) (Miller, Charles)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Allstate Insurance Company to Show Cause why the case should not be remanded for failure to prosecute: Show Cause Response due by 6/5/2019. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
May 9, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Allstate Insurance Company - Receipt No. DET122503 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Allstate Insurance Company (Miller, Charles)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 5/15/2019 (DWor)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-002873-NF. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint) (Miller, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vescio-Baldwin v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles David Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Vescio-Baldwin
Represented By: John Scott Buell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?