Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. McKinley, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Defendant: Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc. and McKinley, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11418
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc. against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company by Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1- Real Estate Management Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2- April 11, 2019 Coverage Position Letter) (Murphy, Lawrence)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by McKinley, Inc. against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company by McKinley, Inc.. (Phillips, Randall)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant, Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc to Respond to #1 Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 7/12/2019.) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (BSau)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J. Murphy on behalf of Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc.. (Murphy, Lawrence)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Extending Time for Defendant, McKinley, Inc to Respond to #1 Complaint. (Responsive Pleading due by 7/3/2019) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Brochert, Stephanie)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by McKinley, Inc. (Phillips, Randall)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Randall E. Phillips appearing on behalf of McKinley, Inc. (Phillips, Randall)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. McKinley, Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Brochert, Stephanie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Brochert, Stephanie)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Vacating #7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 Order to Show Cause by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Newa, Kenneth)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company for McKinley, Inc. (Brochert, Stephanie)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company to Show Cause why this Action should not be Dismissed for Lack of Subect Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 6/3/2019. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Newa on behalf of Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Newa, Kenneth)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc.* (SOso)
May 14, 2019 Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Plaintiff Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, Defendant Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, #3 Notice (Other), #2 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Brochert, Stephanie)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *McKinley, Inc.* (SOso)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE of Error directed to: Stephanie M. Brochert re #1 Complaint,,. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SOso)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company Notice, Consent, And Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Brochert, Stephanie)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corporation, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Brochert, Stephanie)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company against Mt. Hawley Insurance Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7238372 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Marion County Superior Court, 49 D14-1612-PL-044978, Judge James B. Osborn] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Brochert, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company v. McKinley, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie M. Brochert
Represented By: Kenneth C. Newa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleton Corner Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinley, Inc.
Represented By: Randall E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?