United States of America v. Kline et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Discover Bank, Donn A Kline, Michigan Department of Treasury, Oakland County, Michigan, Fifth Third Bank and Capital Alliance Financial, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11434
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Michigan Department of Treasury. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Kerwin, Katherine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Donn A Kline served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Hume, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Discover Bank served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Hume, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan Department of Treasury served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hume, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Oakland County, Michigan served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Hume, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Capital Alliance Financial, LLC served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Hume, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fifth Third Bank served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Hume, Lauren)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Oakland County, Michigan. (Buck, Brandon)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon K. Buck on behalf of Oakland County, Michigan. (Buck, Brandon)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Donn A Kline. Response due by 7/18/2019. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Donn A Kline (Brent, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Donn A Kline. (Attachments: #1 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION) (Brent, Daniel)
May 15, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hume, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kline et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donn A Kline
Represented By: Daniel P. Brent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Treasury
Represented By: Katherine C. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County, Michigan
Represented By: Brandon K. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Alliance Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lauren E. Hume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?