Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Reyes 1, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. and LC Trademarks, Inc.
Defendant: Reyes 1, Inc., Jason Harmon and Artemisa Harmon
Case Number: 2:2019cv11437
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Artemisa Harmon served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Saylor, Larry)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jason Harmon served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Saylor, Larry)
May 16, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Reyes 1, Inc.* (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Jason Harmon* (SOso)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Artemisa Harmon* (SOso)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LC Trademarks, Inc. (Saylor, Larry)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Saylor, Larry)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7240901 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Saylor, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Reyes 1, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reyes 1, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artemisa Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LC Trademarks, Inc.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?