Surgical Center of Southfield, LLC d/b/a Fountain View Surgery Center & Ispine, PLLC v. James River Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Surgical Center of Southfield, LLC d/b/a Fountain View Surgery Center & Ispine, PLLC
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11441
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 2/4/2020 11:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. (DPar)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/30/2020, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/28/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III, Jury Trial set for 8/4/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DPar)
July 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 7/10/2019. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (DPar)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Patton, Lee)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by James River Insurance Company. (Patton, Lee)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, (Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by James River Insurance Company. (Patton, Lee)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for James River Insurance Company to Show Cause why the case should not be remanded for failure to prosecute: Show Cause Response due by 6/5/2019. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by James River Insurance Company. (Patton, Lee)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for James River Insurance Company to Show Cause why Case should not be Remanded for Improperly Pleading: Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2019. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James River Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-006229-NF. Receipt No: 0645-7241757 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: Wayne County Circuit, 19-006229-NF, Judge David J. Allen] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Document Continuation Certificate of Service) (Patton, Lee)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE by James River Insurance Company Notice of Removal (Patton, Lee) Modified on 5/16/2019 (DTyl) [INCORRECT EVENT USED; ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE USING CORRECT EVENT]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surgical Center of Southfield, LLC d/b/a Fountain View Surgery Center & Ispine, PLLC v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surgical Center of Southfield, LLC d/b/a Fountain View Surgery Center & Ispine, PLLC
Represented By: Danielle S. Yatooma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee C. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?