Green et al v. Kirchhoff Automotive USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hilderbrant, Richard Nicholas Gault, Jeffrey Green, Bobbi Jo Hilderbrant, Jamie Heffner, Joshua Allen, Jeffrey Daniel Conley, Ronald R Hayslip, Jr, Jeb Morris, Joshua Lee McCallister, Matthew Vega, Bret Durham, Michael R. Edgington, Bryan C Johnson and Joshua Sines
Defendant: Kirchhoff Automotive USA, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Waverly, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Lansing, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Manchester, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Tecumseh, Inc. and Kirchhoff Automotive Dallas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11471
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Denise Page Hood
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Garry Lamm, Jr. (Morelli, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Timothy Mosley, Jr. (Morelli, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Charles Anderson and Cindy Stidham (Morelli, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Erik Landruno (Morelli, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE by Richard Nicholas Gault, Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Erric Gant, Angelita Martin, Anna Alcorn, Kyle Gilliam and Andrea Walters (Morelli, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Donald Schoolcraft, Austin Warren and Alfred Anderson (Morelli, Robert)
July 23, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Angelie Sparks (Morelli, Robert)
July 22, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Sharon Kems-Jordan, Richard Broughton, Andrew Harris, Brent Vaughn, Thomas Archer, Zayed Saylor and Delia Vann (Morelli, Robert)
July 20, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Christopher Bertram, Melissa Dickens, Kimberly Bertram, Ryan Westfall, Evan Smart and Jeremy Holsinger (Morelli, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Consents to Join of Ronnie Doss and Lama Pittman (Morelli, Robert)
July 14, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Terry Wrinkle, Antonio Gonzales and Thomas Brown (Morelli, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Adam Holt, Andrew Jones, Robert Crabtree, Melissa Spencer, James Puckett, Tina Howe, Jacob Hensley, Tyler Swords, Tiffanie Leach, Jon David DeJurnette, Natashia Edwards, Cody Smith, Zachary Compton, Donna Johnson, Beth Johnson and Troy Vogt (Morelli, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Josh Wetmore and Hiedie Breech (Morelli, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Nichole Scott, Jhon Rollins, Devin Crabtree, D'Ryan Arthur, Kasey Brown, John Helmick, Jeremy Taylor, Shelby Crawford, Jennafer Dewitt and Georgettea Collins (Morelli, Robert)
July 9, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Josh Breech, Glynis Blackburn, Dennis Finchum, Tiffany Baker, Eric Freeman, Heather Bennett-Blanton, Patricia Peoples, Jesse Marium, Terisa Christian, Tammy Hayslip, Dakota Stannope Maryjane Schoemann (Morelli, Robert)
July 8, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Rosa Merino, William Wilson, Jordan Wilson, Brittany Castle, Brian Knight, Edgar Bain and Debbie Ingram (Morelli, Robert)
July 7, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Dustin Schuyler and Katherine McCoy (Morelli, Robert)
July 7, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Brian Kuhn, Shawn Webster, Austin Craig, John A. R. Jordan, Brandon Saylor, Bradley Newsome, Anthony Morrison, Rhonda Courtney, Susan Fults, Raylene Taylor, Kathy Williams, Jason Ragland, Joseph Davenport, Shawnna Winfrey, Chris Garrett, Nathan Cantrell, Valerie Hagan, Joshua Slone, Matt Rhoden, Alex Currithers, Shirley Matthews, Jeffrey Jones, Houston Easton, Dennis W. Jordan and Shannon Tucker (Morelli, Robert)
July 6, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Blane Rawalt, Terance Allen, Patricia Gray, David Yates, Ashley Starkey McCoy, Brian Hill, William Lore, Jonathan Cueva, Shawn Brock, Kamesha Childress, Andrew Billings, Quincey Ealey, Paul Thompson, Kellye Graham, Jackey Winfrey, Teresa Bonk, Kristopher Davis, Debbie Ingram, David Honey and John Marshall (Morelli, Robert)
July 6, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Robbie Evans, Douglas Rife, Karen Uselton, Jason Guinn, Nora Byrd, Catherine Bentley, Ervin Bobst, Christopher Thompson, Bethanie Bush, Barry Clayton, Frank Solis, Crystal Hall, Kevin McCoy, Jamie Golden, Brittney Clark, Dale Zirkles, Jan Gill, Blanca Vargas, John May, Emily Owens and Limayla Seda (Morelli, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Anthony Francis, Dorel Holman, Samuel Parker, Tiffany Baker, Jonathan Shannon, Philip Gonzales, Melissa Baker, Mark Davis, Santiago Jantes, Derek Stevens, Josefina Grifaldo, Kayla Haslip, Jonathan Whitman, Randy Harsdorf and Rhonda Simmons (Morelli, Robert)
July 1, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join John Vineyard, Melissa bulington, Arlisse Campbell, Buck Montgomery, Gary Giles, Debbie Higgins, Khadijah Blair and Amy Flowers (Morelli, Robert)
June 30, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Jamie Jackson, Brenda Hastings, Christian Darnell, Bobbi Jo Hilderbrant and David Clifford (Morelli, Robert)
June 29, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Sydney Brown, Richard Swain, Ashley Hill, Danny Slagle, Joshua Clark, Melissa Adkins, Russell Eads, Waylon Lumbley, Joshua Gilliam, Uriah Bohannon, Joe Jones, Larry Johnson, Robin Black and Matthew Wayne Bunde (Morelli, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Robbyn Myers and Brian Floyd (Morelli, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join David Hunter, Jesse Waldrop, Jamie Golden and Stephanie Fults (Morelli, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Angela Haston and Sarah Wyatt (Morelli, Robert)
June 22, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Cornelius Starks, Randy Davis, Jr., Ceasarae Poling, Ralph Nunley, Jr., Craig Williams, Justin Stoddard, Heath Mustard and Jeff Scott (Morelli, Robert)
June 19, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Arlissa Campbell, Matthew Roberts, Jeremy Moulder, Michael Fuqua and Allen Bell (Morelli, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Terisha Christian, Gabriel Martinez and Michael Justice (Morelli, Robert)
June 17, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Ashley Lack, Emmett Zelenka, William Poe, Brittany Hunt and Ruth Hunt (Morelli, Robert)
June 15, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Laraina Kehrer, Russell Pickens, Chris Lewis, Stuart Bradford, Patrick Williams, Erica Miller, Chad Coppinger and Loretta Gray (Morelli, Robert)
June 15, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Andrew Prince, Terry Clifford and Sarah Fish (Morelli, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Douglas Nutt, Jim Gill, Neal Bess and Tiffany Raines (Morelli, Robert)
June 10, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Anthony Jordan, Jerry Crouch, Shannon Holt, Randy Vital, Dustin Alexander and Jennifer Decourcy (Morelli, Robert)
June 9, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Cody Smith (Morelli, Robert)
June 8, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Brian Sturgill, Paul Rayburn, Jr., Donnie Workman, Amanda Ash, Leslie Rogers, Tyler Rhett Garner, Samantha Uselton, Christina Trail, Stephen Trousdale, Christopher Meade, Lamar Garrard, Jeff Whaley, Tiffiany Dodson, Lucia Bohannon and Jonathan Racine (Morelli, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Tiara Walters (Morelli, Robert)
June 5, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Matthew Smith, Shane Thomas, Elmer Smith, Robert Coble, John Gee, Michael Patterson, Anna Alcorn, Eric Parks, Zachary Russell, Lisa Gibson, Aaron Boyer, Devin Crabtree, Jonathan Stevens, Tracy Nemuth, Teri Parks, Ova Key, Claudio Solorio, Melisa Ballard, Samuel Taber, Mary Lemmons, Bradley Behr and Paul Holsinger (Morelli, Robert)
June 4, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Opt-in Plaintiff Laura Keim Notice of Withdrawal from Lawsuit (Morelli, Robert)
June 3, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Darrell Fitch, Edward Egnor, Benjamin, Hawk, Jessica Dewitt, Elizabeth Chapman, Jacqueline Wilson, Chris Davis, James Centerbas, Janeen Stark, Christian Darnell, Donna Johnson, and Buck Montgomery (Morelli, Robert)
June 1, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join King Joker Lee, James Marcoux, Peter Schwendeman, Casey Shelton, Makayla Yates-Bishop, Kalene Hoch, Joshua Lamley, Jared Smoot, Frank Solis, Darryl Trice, Rachel Zahn, Kevin Crichlow, Jack R. Shane, Jr., Joshua Stevens, Tonya Shank, Joshua Swoape, Harry Whigham, Jr., Cerridwen Kaiding, Shelbi Richards, Joe Jones, Brittany Schoolcraft, Patrick Sturgill, Michael Burch, Timberly Hughes, William Hughes, Dillon Scott, Crystal Hammond, Michael Frazier, Rebekka Freeze, Justin Wilber, Steven Armentroyt and Michael Cupp (Morelli, Robert)
May 29, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Joy Alexander, Russell Christian, Felicia Esparza, Milton Freeze, Sherry Rivera Garcia, Daniel Gillespie, Pamela Grenillo, Ronald Hayslip, Kayla Howard, Laura Keim, Julie Palazzi, Jacob Sanders, Walter Schoenmann, Richard Swain, Kayla Thomas, Wesley Tutrow, Stephen Whitman and Alicia Woodward (Morelli, Robert)
May 27, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Dustin Bram, Richard Stone, Travis Irvin and Michael J. Chaney (Morelli, Robert)
May 26, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Antonio Ramirez, Kayla Thomas and Jeffrey Chaney (Morelli, Robert)
May 22, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Mailing to the Putative Class (Morelli, Robert)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension #45 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 2, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension re #44 Order on Motion - Free, #41 Order (Unopposed) by All Plaintiffs. (Morelli, Robert)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of All Deadlines and Tolling Agreement #43 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
March 25, 2020 Filing 43 Joint MOTION Motion for Extension and Tolling Agreement re #41 Order by All Plaintiffs. (Morelli, Robert)
March 17, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (Answer to Second Amended Collective Action Complaint) by All Defendants. (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood on #40 Joint Stipulation for Notice and Opt-In Period. (MacKay, K)
March 5, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR NOTICE AND OPT-IN PERIOD by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice - Right to Join) (McManus, Jennifer)
March 3, 2020 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand SECOND AMENDED COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Kirchhoff Automotive Manchester, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive USA, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Waverly, Inc.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Green Consent to Join, #2 Exhibit B - Morris Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit C - Sines Consent to Join) (McManus, Jennifer)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion for Conditional Certification due by 4/3/2020 Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
November 26, 2019 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed order) (McManus, Jennifer)
November 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Opt-in Plaintiff Phillip Snook Withdrawal from Lawsuit (Morelli, Robert)
October 22, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Robert Wirtz (Morelli, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Eric Rowlson (Morelli, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Alyssa Slagel (Morelli, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Maria Valle (Morelli, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Turner, Robert)
August 14, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Leandro Galnares (Morelli, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Arlissa Campbell (Morelli, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consents to Join Jeffrey Halberstadt and Gary Beatenhead (Morelli, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Jessica Cooper (Morelli, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Darious Collins (Morelli, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Crystal Morris (Morelli, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Phillip Snook (Morelli, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Jeffrey Green Consent to Join Latonia Gaston (Morelli, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Morelli, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Danny Valasek by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Robert Purtee by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - William Gilbert Jr by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Racheal Chaney by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery on Conditional Certification Motion Issues to be completed by 12/16/2019 Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (Refer to image for additional dates) (LSau)
July 10, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference Hearing on July 15, 2019 is Cancelled re #8 Notice to Appear. (LSau)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (McManus, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Carrie Pollard by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Katheryn Jones by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Casey Holbrook by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Johanna Scarberry by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Deanna Hockenberry by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT re #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, CONSENT TO JOIN - Amber L. Dir by All Plaintiffs (McManus, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lossia McManus on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McManus, Jennifer)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Move in Response to Plaintiffs'. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2019 10:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Kirchhoff Automotive Dallas, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Lansing, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Manchester, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Tecumseh, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive USA, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Waverly, Inc.. (Mersol, Gregory)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil J. Juliar on behalf of All Defendants. (Juliar, Neil)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Move in Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Unopposed) by Kirchhoff Automotive Dallas, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Lansing, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Manchester, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Tecumseh, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive USA, Inc., Kirchhoff Automotive Waverly, Inc.. (Mersol, Gregory)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Docket Sheet from Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00003. Modified on 5/20/2019 (VLun).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Change Venue. The case SHALL be transferred to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, Southern Division. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 5/20/2019. (AML) [Transferred from tned on 5/20/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Jeffrey Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from tned on 5/20/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3853841.), filed by Jeffrey Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Jeffrey Green Consent to Join, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to be Issued for Kirchhoff Automotive USA, #4 Summons to be Issued for Kirchhoff Automotive Manchester, #5 Summons to be Issued for Kirchhoff Automotive Dallas, #6 Summons to be Issued for Kirchhoff Automotive Waverly, #7 Summons to be Issued for Kirchhoff Automotive Tecumseh, #8 Summons to be Issued for Kirchhoff Automotive Lansing)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00003.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Kirchhoff Automotive USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hilderbrant
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nicholas Gault
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Green
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbi Jo Hilderbrant
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Heffner
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Allen
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Daniel Conley
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R Hayslip, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeb Morris
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lee McCallister
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Vega
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Durham
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Edgington
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan C Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Sines
Represented By: Jennifer Lossia McManus
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirchhoff Automotive USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Represented By: Neil J. Juliar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirchhoff Automotive Waverly, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Represented By: Neil J. Juliar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirchhoff Automotive Lansing, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Represented By: Neil J. Juliar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirchhoff Automotive Manchester, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Represented By: Neil J. Juliar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirchhoff Automotive Tecumseh, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Represented By: Neil J. Juliar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirchhoff Automotive Dallas, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Represented By: Neil J. Juliar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?