Export Development Canada v. SDR Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Export Development Canada
Defendant: SDR Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11536
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David M Lawson
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by SDR Group, Inc.. (Essique, Christine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Holly C. Beatty appearing on behalf of SDR Group, Inc. (Beatty, Holly)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Frederick D. Elias appearing on behalf of SDR Group, Inc. (Elias, Frederick)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by SDR Group, Inc. (Beatty, Holly)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER striking improper filing. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by SDR Group, Inc. (Beatty, Holly)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 [STRICKEN PER 06/24/19 ORDER] STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by SDR Group, Inc. (Beatty, Holly) Modified on 6/25/2019 (DPer).
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Export Development Canada served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Begon, Anthony)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *SDR Group, Inc.* (LGra)
May 28, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against SDR Group, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7255737 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Ontario - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet) (Begon, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Export Development Canada v. SDR Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDR Group, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick D. Elias
Represented By: Christine R. Essique
Represented By: Holly C. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Export Development Canada
Represented By: Anthony J. Begon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?