K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc.
Interested Party: Daniel M. McDermott, Cleaning Contractors, Inc and Chemical Bank
Appellant: Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund
Appellee: K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11547
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Vacate Order and to Dismiss the Operating Engineers' Local 324, Pension Fund's Appeal of the Order Authorizing the Sale of Certain of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances to Cleaning Contractors, Inc., and Granting Related Relief by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc.. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 17, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Supplemental Record on Appeal (VLun)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 Supplemental Designated Bankruptcy Record - Transcripts from 04/22/2019 and 05/09/2019 [ATTACHMENTS INTENDED FOR OTHER CIVIL CASES] (Attachments: #1 Transcripts from 04/22/2019 and 05/17/2019, #2 Transcripts from 04/22/2019 and 05/24/2019) (VLun) Modified on 7/17/2019 (VLun).
July 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 7/12/2019 (MVer)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James M. McArdle appearing on behalf of K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (McArdle, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John D. McClune appearing on behalf of Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund (McClune, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc. (Brimer, Lynn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 7/12/2019 10:30 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
June 25, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Complete Record on Appeal (VLun)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Designated Bankruptcy Record (VLun)
May 28, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Documents on Ronna Jackson (VLun)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund, Bankruptcy Court case number 19-43823. (VLun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Daniel M. McDermott
Represented By: Ronna Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cleaning Contractors, Inc
Represented By: Brendan G. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Chemical Bank
Represented By: Christina Mazzara
Represented By: Anthony G. Mammina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Operating Engineers' Local 324 Pension Fund
Represented By: David M. Eisenberg
Represented By: Craig E. Zucker
Represented By: John D. McClune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: K & D Industrial Services Holding Co., Inc.
Represented By: Lynn M. Brimer
Represented By: Pamela S. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?