U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2018-2 v. The Agency Realty Executives, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2018-2
Defendant: Fred Dabaja, Jane Doe, State of Michigan, Department of Treasury, Fadi Dabaja, United States of America, Department of of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, The Agency Realty Executives, LLC, Mohamad Taha, Unknown Tenant and Lendinghome Funding Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv11553
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Agency Realty Executives, LLC served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Prendergast, Zachary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America, Department of of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. (Ziedas, Tauras)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Order of Service by Posting or Publication. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Agency Realty Executives, LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Prendergast, Zachary)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued for *The Agency Realty Executives, LLC* (DWor)
June 28, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for The Agency Realty Executives, LLC. (Prendergast, Zachary)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order of Service by Posting or Publication by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2018-2. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Prendergast, Zachary)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued for *Fred Dabaja, Mohamad Taha, The Agency Realty Executives, LLC* (DWor)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of United States of America, Department of of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service served on 4/26/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Prendergast, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Attorney General of the United States served on 4/30/19. (Prendergast, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Treasurer Rachel Eubanks served on 04/29/19. (Prendergast, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Lendinghome Funding Corporation served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Prendergast, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Fred Dabaja, Jane Doe, Mohamad Taha, The Agency Realty Executives, LLC, Unknown Tenant. (Prendergast, Zachary)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re Complaint within #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United States of America, Department of of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. Response due by 7/12/2019 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
May 28, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-006040-CZ. No Fee Required - US Government. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ziedas, Tauras)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2018-2 v. The Agency Realty Executives, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Dabaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Michigan, Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fadi Dabaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Tauras N. Ziedas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Agency Realty Executives, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamad Taha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lendinghome Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2018-2
Represented By: Zachary D. Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?